Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Francesco Roberti

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1629³BornRecanati
7 Jul 168051.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jul 168051.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 168556.2AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
23 Sep 168556.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
26 Jan 170171.5DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Francesco Roberti:
Archbishop Antonio Francesco Roberti (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 399
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 28
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 17 Aug 2015