Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Marinelli

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1935 Born
25 Mar 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 200064.4AppointedArchbishop of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
29 Apr 200064.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
27 May 200064.6InstalledArchbishop of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
24 Jun 201175.7RetiredArchbishop of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Marinelli
Archbishop Francesco Marinelli (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAppignano del Tronto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Urbino-Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,750

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast