Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Balardi Arrigoni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste

Bishop of Urbino


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Feb 1407AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
10 Jan 1418AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
11 Dec 1424AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
12 Sep 1435DiedBishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Balardi Arrigoni:
Bishop Giacomo Balardi Arrigoni O.P. (died ) Bishop of Trieste

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 296, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 509
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013