Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Tommaso Maria Marelli, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Imola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1673BornRobassomero
16 Aug 169219.1ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
21 Dec 169724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
7 Dec 171643.4AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
21 Dec 171643.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
23 Feb 173965.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
9 Feb 175278.6DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Maria Marelli:
Archbishop Giovanni Tommaso Maria Marelli C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 399
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015