Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Polcenigo

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1647³BornFanna
8 Aug 168336.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 168437.0AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
1 May 168437.0Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
Apr 1724³76.9DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Polcenigo:
Bishop Antonio Polcenigo (born , died Apr 1724) Bishop of Feltre

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015