Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Giannotti

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹BornRoma
26 Apr 168247.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 168247.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 168247.3AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
14 Jun 168247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
Apr 1699³64.2DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Giannotti:
Bishop Francesco Maria Giannotti (born 1635, died Apr 1699) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 16.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 357
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015