Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Gabrieli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1645³BornVilla Rivolti
21 Sep 167025.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 168439.3AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
25 Jun 168439.4Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
12 Apr 171772.1ResignedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Gabrieli:
Bishop Nicolaus Gabrieli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Novigrad (Cittanova)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015