Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Minio

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1628BornBurano
24 Apr 168456.1AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
1 May 168456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
5 Jun 169870.2DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Minio:
Bishop Domenico Minio (born , died ) Bishop of Caorle

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013