Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano David

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1636Born
21 Dec 165822.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 168448.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
25 Jun 168448.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1687²51.0DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano David
Bishop Stefano David (born , died 1687) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaorle

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast