Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Cuppari

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1635³BornSplit
8 Aug 166125.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Aug 166125.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 168448.7AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
25 Jun 168448.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
1694¹58.3DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Cuppari:
Bishop Joannes Cuppari (born , died 1694) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1684, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015