Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Fieschi, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643BornJanuen
14 Jun 168340.5AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
20 Jun 168340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
28 May 168542.4DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

MicroData Summary for Agostino Fieschi:
Bishop Agostino Fieschi C.R. (died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 256
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013