Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista de Belli

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1630³BornRodi
24 Apr 168454.0AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 May 168454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
Sep 1693³63.4DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Belli:
Bishop Giovanni Battista de Belli (born , died Sep 1693) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 374
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015