Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Veroli

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1437AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
25 Sep 1439AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
11 Sep 1452AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
26 May 1463AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
8 Oct 1464AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
1478¹DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Veroli:
Bishop Andrea Veroli Bishop of Camerino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 108, and Page 135
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 260, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013