Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vitaliano Visconti Borromeo

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

Apostolic Nuncio to Emperor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornMilano, Italy
4 Jul 161625.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
14 Aug 161625.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
25 Aug 161625.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
May 1617³26.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitaliano Visconti Borromeo (VIAF: 304913821)
Archbishop Vitaliano Visconti Borromeo (born 1591, died May 1617) Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 61, Number 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 17
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016