Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Volpi

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1585Born
23 May 162237.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
23 May 162237.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
12 Jun 162237.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
26 Jul 162439.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Novara, Italy
10 Mar 162943.8SucceededBishop of Novara, Italy
12 Sep 163651.3DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Volpi
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Volpi (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262, and Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 76, Number 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018