Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Sousa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹Born
22 Aug 159450.6AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Feb 159551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1 May 159652.3DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de Sousa
Bishop António de Sousa O.P. (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSao Domingos, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018