Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Brandão, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jan 1556Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Aug 1588AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
Dec 1588²Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
14 Jun 1608DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Brandão
Bishop Pedro Brandão O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCarmelite, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceTelleiras

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,414
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,607

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast