Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amador Arrais de Mendoza, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
14 Jan 154515.0EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
31 Jan 154616.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
23 Jul 156838.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
23 Jul 156838.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
8 Nov 156838.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
30 Oct 158151.8AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
23 Jan 158252.0InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
1598²68.0ResignedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
1 Aug 160070.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Amador Arrais de Mendoza (VIAF: 45095869)
Bishop Amador Arrais de Mendoza O. Carm. (born 1530, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeja
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 79, Number 471
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 319, and Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018