Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julião de Alva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500Born
21 Aug 154949.6ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
16 Jun 155050.4InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
5 Apr 156060.2AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
1564¹64.0ResignedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
13 Feb 157070.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Julião de Alva
Bishop Julião de Alva
(born 1500, died )
Bishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrigal de las Altas Torres, Spain

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 246
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 7 May 2025