Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Andrés de Oviedo, S.J. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517¹BornIllescas, Spain
1549²32.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
23 Jan 155538.1AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia
23 Jan 155538.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
5 May 155538.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
22 Dec 156246.0SucceededPatriarch of Ethiopia
9 Jul 157760.5DiedPatriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Oviedo:
Patriarch Andrés de Oviedo S.J. (died ) Patriarch of Ethiopia

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 97, and Page 210
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 65, Number 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013