Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Cão, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1554AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
14 Sep 1554Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
25 Aug 1574DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Cão
Bishop Gaspar Cão O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Viçosa, Portugal
Ordained BishopSte Marie de la Grace, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceSão Tomé, Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • bp/d: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018