Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco da Cruz, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
3 Jul 154532.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
3 Jul 154532.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
18 Aug 155340.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
Mar 1571³58.1ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
19 Mar 157461.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco da Cruz
Bishop Francisco da Cruz O.S.A. (born 1513, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Viçosa

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • bp/bd/r: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 16*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 211, and Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018