Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar do Casal, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
3 Jul 155141.5AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
1556¹46.0ResignedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
20 Dec 155747.9AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
27 Nov 157969.9AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
9 Aug 158474.6DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar do Casal (VIAF: 44641346)
Bishop Gaspar do Casal O.S.A. (born 1510, died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantarém
Ordained BishopO.S.A., Convent, Santarém
Death PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 171, and Page 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,350
  • bp/bd: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018