Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Bevilacqua, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1587AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
27 Dec 1587³Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
4 Sep 1604DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bevilacqua
Archbishop Girolamo Bevilacqua O.F.M. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpello, Diocese of Foligno, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 Apr 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017