Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Filippo Sfondrati, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1636BornMandello
20 Sep 165923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
12 Jul 167741.1AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
25 Jul 167741.2Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
11 May 168044.0DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Filippo Sfondrati:
Bishop Carlo Filippo Sfondrati B. (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015