Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Montecatini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornFerrara, Italy
26 Mar 165641.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 169075.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
16 Jul 169075.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
20 Mar 169984.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Montecatini:
Archbishop Charles Montecatini (born 1615, died ) Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015