Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Martire Giustiniani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹BornChios
10 Dec 169146.9AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 Jan 169247.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
10 May 170055.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tinos, Greece
Jan 1715³70.0DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Martire Giustiniani:
Archbishop Pietro Martire Giustiniani O.P. (born 1645, died Jan 1715) Bishop of Tinos

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015