Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Carrone

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1641BornSan Guido d'Ostuni
19 Dec 169150.0AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
13 Jan 169250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
Apr 1706³64.3DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Carrone:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Carrone (born , died Apr 1706) Bishop of Strongoli

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015