Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Ramírez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1648Born
28 Feb 168941.0AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
6 Mar 168941.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
26 Aug 169749.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
27 Aug 171567.5DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ramírez
Archbishop Francesco Ramírez O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstremera, Spain

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 129
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 230, Number 1,434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018