Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Sanudo

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1642³BornVenezia
26 May 166522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Jun 166522.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 168441.8AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
24 Jun 168441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
Jan 1709³66.4DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Sanudo:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Sanudo (born , died Jan 1709) Bishop of Treviso

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015