Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Valentini

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1619BornMontalcino
15 Jun 164728.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 168566.0AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
23 Apr 168566.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
Sep 1687³68.4DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Valentini:
Bishop Pietro Valentini (born , died Sep 1687) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015