Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Petra

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1664AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
29 Apr 1680AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
1 Feb 1699DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Petra
Archbishop Diego Petra (died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast