Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Riccanale

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634BornTeramen
2 Oct 168450.8AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
8 Oct 168450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
Mar 168551.2DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Riccanale:
Bishop Giovanni Riccanale Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013