Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Bartolo

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1627Born
11 Mar 166840.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 167244.7AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
18 Sep 167244.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
18 Sep 168456.7AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Nov 1685³57.8DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Bartolo
Bishop Benedetto Bartolo (born , died Nov 1685) Bishop of Belcastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiarutana

  • a priest for 17.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,672, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast