Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Luigi Malaspina, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637¹BornFirenze
2 Oct 168447.7AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
8 Oct 168447.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
2 May 169558.3AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
Dec 1705³68.9DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Malaspina:
Bishop Pietro Luigi Malaspina C.R. (born 1637, died Dec 1705) Bishop of Massa Marittima

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174, and Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015