Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Francolisio (d’Aquino)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1639BornNapoli
30 Nov 167233.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 167333.5AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Mar 167333.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
18 Jun 167636.8ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
23 Mar 171575.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Francolisio (d’Aquino):
Bishop Andrea Francolisio (d’Aquino) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 380, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015