Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Libelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹Born
30 Jan 167357.0AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
24 Feb 167357.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
23 Oct 168468.8DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Libelli (VIAF: 89173902)
Archbishop Giacinto Libelli O.P. (born 1616, died ) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello, Diocese of Città di Castello, Italy

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast