Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Leopardi

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1635BornBonihabitaculi
14 Mar 167136.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 168348.6AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
3 Oct 168348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1 Oct 168550.6AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
5 Feb 171782.0DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Leopardi:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Leopardi (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258, and Page 388
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015