Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Nepita

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornVastro Villari
20 Mar 164925.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 168056.0AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
14 Jan 168056.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
26 Mar 168561.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
12 Jul 170177.5DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Nepita:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Nepita (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85, and Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015