Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Vusich

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1647BornVenetiis
14 Jun 168840.9AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
27 Jun 168841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Oct 168942.2DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vusich:
Bishop Giovanni Vusich (born ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013