Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Emo

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1644Born
1 Feb 168843.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 168843.9AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
27 Jun 168844.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
Jan 1705³60.5DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Emo
Archbishop Giorgio Emo (born , died Jan 1705) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a priest for 16.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1688, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast