Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Gjivoje

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1851BornLastovo
30 Nov 187524.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
5 Dec 187524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
18 May 191160.3SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
11 Jul 191160.4ConfirmedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
8 Oct 191160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
27 Feb 191766.1DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Gjivoje:
Bishop Antun Gjivoje (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 69
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013