Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pacifico Bizza

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1695Born
16 Apr 171822.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 173843.5AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
30 Nov 173843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
17 Jan 174650.7AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
13 May 175661.0DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Bizza
Archbishop Pacifico Bizza (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbe

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018