Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciro de Alteriis

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1694³BornNapoli
13 Mar 171722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Oct 175460.6SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
16 Dec 175460.7ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
22 Dec 175460.7Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
14 Mar 176166.9SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
6 Apr 176167.0ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
13 Oct 177581.5DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ciro de Alteriis:
Bishop Ciro de Alteriis (born , died ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 63, and Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013