Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Aurelio Petruccelli

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1705³BornCastrifranchi
18 Sep 172823.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175449.3AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
22 Dec 175449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
18 Nov 178277.2DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Aurelio Petruccelli:
Bishop Marco Aurelio Petruccelli (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1754, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015