Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Dinaricio

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1700³BornHvar
10 Jun 172423.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 172424.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 174545.2AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
28 Nov 174545.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
3 Jan 175756.3AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
Jun 1764³63.7DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Dinaricio:
Archbishop Nicolaus Dinaricio (born Sep 1700, died Jun 1764) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015