Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Borgia

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1689BornVelletri
24 Feb 171424.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172940.1AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
1 Jan 173040.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
2 Sep 175464.8DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Borgia:
Bishop Fabrizio Borgia (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015