Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Borgia

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1682BornVelletri
19 Apr 171027.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 171533.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 171633.7AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
12 Jul 171633.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
20 Nov 172442.0AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
14 Feb 176481.3DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Borgia:
Archbishop Alessandro Borgia (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 202, and Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013