Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1696BornMarsico
3 Jun 171923.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 173943.1AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
19 Jul 173943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
23 Feb 175053.7AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
14 Nov 175559.4DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Rossi:
Bishop Cesare Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235, and Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015