Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beninj Antun Albertini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1789BornDubrovnik
1814²24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 183242.4AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
22 Jul 183242.6Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
28 Jul 183848.7SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
24 Aug 183848.7DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Beninj Antun Albertini:
Bishop Beninj Antun Albertini O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013